Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Martínez De Aguirre Guinea, O.P.

Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru

Titular Bishop of Izirzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1970 Born
18 Sep 199323.6Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Dec 199929.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Jul 201444.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru
8 Jul 201444.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Izirzada
11 Oct 201444.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Izirzada
23 Jun 201545.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru

MicroData Summary for David Martínez De Aguirre Guinea
Bishop David Martínez De Aguirre Guinea O.P. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitória-Gasteiz, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 1 Aug 2014
  • c2+: CB, 2 Sep 2014
  • c2+: CB, 14 Oct 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,306
  • s: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018