Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Tomás Zárraga Colmenares

Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1957 BornCaserio Azaro
14 Sep 198527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Coro, Venezuela
12 Jul 199739.8IncardinatedPriest of Punto Fijo, Venezuela
27 Dec 200245.2AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
15 Mar 200345.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
29 Mar 200345.5InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
10 Nov 201457.1ResignedBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Jesús Tomás Zárraga Colmenares:
Bishop Jesús Tomás Zárraga Colmenares (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Carlos de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,345
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015