Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Xie Ting Zhe

Deceased

Bishop of Xinjiang-Urumqi [Sinkiang], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Urumqi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1931Born
25 Feb 197948.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 199160.8Ordained BishopBishop of Xinjiang-Urumqi [Sinkiang], China
14 Aug 201786.6DiedBishop of Xinjiang-Urumqi [Sinkiang], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Xie Ting Zhe
Bishop Paul Xie Ting Zhe (born , died ) Bishop of Xinjiang-Urumqi [Sinkiang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLanzhou
Death PlaceUrumqi, Prefecture Apostolic of Xinjiang-Urumqi [Sinkiang]

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,018, Page 1,136
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,204
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast