Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Teofil von Wolicki

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1768³Born
1792¹23.1Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
29 May 182859.5SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
15 Dec 182860.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
17 May 182960.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
21 Dec 182961.1DiedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teofil von Wolicki (VIAF: 15645507)
Archbishop Teofil von Wolicki (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGodzietowice, Archdiocese of Gniezno
Ordained BishopPoznań, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 May 2020

Quantcast