Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Weinbacher

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Thala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1901Born
20 Jul 192422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
4 Jun 196260.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
4 Jun 196260.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thala
1 Jul 196260.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thala
15 Jun 198583.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Jakob Weinbacher
Bishop Jakob Weinbacher (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 96
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast