Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop León Villuendas Polo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1885BornTorrijo del Campo
21 Aug 191024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Mar 194458.3AppointedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
16 Jul 194458.6Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
6 Dec 196883.0DiedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain

MicroData Summary for León Villuendas Polo:
Bishop León Villuendas Polo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013