Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio Vincentini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1624BornRieti
30 Sep 166844.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 166944.8AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
7 Apr 166944.8Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
24 Apr 168459.8ResignedBishop of Foligno, Italy
1692²67.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Vincentini:
Bishop Marcantonio Vincentini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 205
  • c34: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015