Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Vieira da Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609¹Born
17 Jun 166960.4AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
12 Jul 167162.5Ordained BishopBishop of Leiria, Portugal
12 Sep 167667.6DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Vieira da Silva
Bishop Pedro Vieira da Silva (born 1609, died ) Bishop of Leiria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeiria

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,635
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017