Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Vaniyapurackal

Curial Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar), India

Titular Bishop of Troyna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1967 Born
30 Dec 199225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar), India
1 Sep 201750.4AppointedCurial Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar), India
1 Sep 201750.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Troyna
12 Nov 201750.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troyna

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Vaniyapurackal
Bishop Sebastian Vaniyapurackal (born ) Curial Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMulamkunnu, Diocese of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopSt. Dominic's, Cathedral, Kanjirapally, Diocese of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2017
  • opd/c1: CB, 4 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 12 Nov 2017