Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Victor Valleau

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1835Born
25 May 186125.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
26 Nov 189257.0SelectedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
19 Jan 189357.1ConfirmedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
5 Mar 189357.3Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
24 Dec 189863.1DiedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Victor Valleau (VIAF: 206186119)
Bishop Henri-Victor Valleau (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Couarde-sur-Mer, Diocese of La Rochelle (-Saintes)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saintes, Diocese of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017