Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan María Uriarte Goiricelaya

Bishop Emeritus of San Sebastián


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1933 BornFrúniz
28 Jul 195724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bilbao, Spain
17 Sep 197643.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bilbao, Spain
17 Sep 197643.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
11 Oct 197643.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae
17 Oct 199158.3AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
13 Jan 200066.5AppointedBishop of San Sebastián, Spain
21 Nov 200976.4RetiredBishop of San Sebastián, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan María Uriarte Goiricelaya:
Bishop Juan María Uriarte Goiricelaya (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Sebastián

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Sebastián.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015