Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne Ung’eyowun Bediwegi

Bishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1959 Born
10 Aug 198829.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Mar 200848.9AppointedBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Jun 200849.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Etienne Ung’eyowun Bediwegi
Bishop Etienne Ung’eyowun Bediwegi (born ) Bishop of Bondo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyalebbe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bondo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,758

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018