Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando Trasarti

Bishop of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1948 Born
1 Nov 197426.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 200759.4AppointedBishop of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola, Italy
7 Oct 200759.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola, Italy
21 Oct 200759.6InstalledBishop of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Armando Trasarti
Bishop Armando Trasarti (born ) Bishop of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampofilone

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fano-Fossombrone-Cagli-Pergola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,551

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast