Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Traoré

Bishop of Ségou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1955 BornBanakouru
6 Jul 198529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ségou, Mali
30 Oct 200348.0AppointedBishop of Ségou, Mali
14 Mar 200448.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ségou, Mali

MicroData Summary for Augustin Traoré:
Bishop Augustin Traoré (born ) Bishop of Ségou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ségou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,546

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013