Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amândio José Tomás

Bishop Emeritus of Vila Real, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1943 Born
15 Aug 196724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Vila Real, Portugal
5 Oct 200158.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal
5 Oct 200158.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
6 Jan 200258.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
8 Jan 200864.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vila Real, Portugal
17 May 201168.0SucceededBishop of Vila Real, Portugal
11 May 201976.0RetiredBishop of Vila Real, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Amândio José Tomás (VIAF: 98584832)
Bishop Amândio José Tomás (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Vila Real

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCimo da Vila da Castanheira
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vila Real.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2008
  • s: Bollettino, 17 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,102
  • r: Bollettino, 11 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 May 2019

Quantcast