Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Tji Hak Soun

Deceased

Bishop of Wonju, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1921Born
15 Dec 195231.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 196543.5AppointedBishop of Wonju, Korea (South)
29 Jun 196543.8Ordained BishopBishop of Wonju, Korea (South)
12 Mar 199371.5DiedBishop of Wonju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Daniel Tji Hak Soun
Bishop Daniel Tji Hak Soun (born , died ) Bishop of Wonju

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChung Hwa

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018