Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn

Dioecesis Chuncheonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 March 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Seoul
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Korea, Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 17,000 (6,566 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocc.or.kr/
  • Mailing Address: Diocesan Office, Ch'unch'on-shi Hyoja 2-dong 400, Kang-won 200-948, Korea
  • Telephone: (033)240-6032
  • Fax: 240-6034

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Shunsen
25 April 1939ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Shunsen (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Chunchon
16 July 1950Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Shunsen Prefecture Apostolic of Chunchon
Vicariate Apostolic of Chunchon
20 September 1955ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Chunchon Vicariate Apostolic of Chunchon
Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn
10 March 1962ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chunchon Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn
197031,8682,000,0001.6%112940796294123ap1971
198035,6641,279,0002.8%231437963144528ap1981
199045,3671,119,0004.1%50757795136434ap1991
199961,0751,156,3925.3%628708722418446ap2000
200064,5311,078,8766.0%647719082622542ap2001
200166,9501,075,7596.2%6210729292220347ap2002
200269,7751,132,4626.2%6613798833218747ap2003
200370,3401,162,3216.1%6912818684819847ap2004
200472,2951,144,9306.3%7011818924621549ap2005
200673,3661,190,7356.2%7913927973723049ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 17 Mar 2013