Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Xaverius Eikichi Tanaka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Takamatsu, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1902Born
21 Dec 193533.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 196361.2AppointedBishop of Takamatsu, Japan
20 Oct 196361.3Ordained BishopBishop of Takamatsu, Japan
11 Jan 197774.5RetiredBishop of Takamatsu, Japan
20 May 198380.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Takamatsu, Japan

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Xaverius Eikichi Tanaka
Bishop Franciscus Xaverius Eikichi Tanaka (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Takamatsu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToshima-Mura

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018