Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Albino Symon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Płock

Titular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1841BornDubowiec
17 May 186221.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Oct 186423.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 189150.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
17 Dec 189150.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
27 Mar 189251.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
2 Aug 189756.4AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
4 Mar 190160.0ResignedBishop of Płock, Poland
15 Apr 190160.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
26 May 191877.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Francesco Albino Symon:
Archbishop Francesco Albino Symon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Płock

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 129, and Page 460
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 602

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013