Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Sangval Surasarang

Bishop Emeritus of Chiang Mai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1935 BornTambon Nakhok
22 Dec 196227.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 198651.1AppointedBishop of Chiang Mai, Thailand
6 Jan 198751.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chiang Mai, Thailand
10 Feb 200973.5ResignedBishop of Chiang Mai, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sangval Surasarang:
Bishop Joseph Sangval Surasarang (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiang Mai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chiang Mai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013