Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Vira Arpondratana

Bishop of Chiang Mai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1955 BornSam Saem
7 Jun 198125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bangkok, Thailand
10 Feb 200953.3AppointedBishop of Chiang Mai, Thailand
1 May 200953.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chiang Mai, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Vira Arpondratana:
Bishop Francis Xavier Vira Arpondratana (born ) Bishop of Chiang Mai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chiang Mai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015