Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hieronim Stojnowski (Stroynowski)

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1752³BornNastasowicw
23 Mar 177623.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Apr 177623.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 180451.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
20 Aug 180451.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
19 Jan 180855.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
26 Sep 181462.0AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 Aug 181562.9DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hieronim Stojnowski (Stroynowski):
Bishop Hieronim Stojnowski (Stroynowski) (born , died ) Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,030
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 229, and Page 244
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013