Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Chryzostom Kaczkowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Chariopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1744³Born
21 Apr 176723.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Apr 176723.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 178137.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
25 Jun 178137.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Chariopolis
24 Feb 181672.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Chryzostom Kaczkowski
Bishop Jan Chryzostom Kaczkowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisowczyki

  • a priest for 48.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 162, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018