Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kanty Podhorodeński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz)

Titular Bishop of Polemonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1741³BornWlodzimierz Wolynski
17 Mar 176422.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Sep 176422.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 180462.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
20 Aug 180462.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Polemonium
4 Oct 183291.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Kanty Podhorodeński:
Bishop Jan Kanty Podhorodeński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz)

  • a priest for 68.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • bp/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013