Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Sproll

Deceased

Bishop of Rottenburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1870BornSchweinhausen
16 Jul 189524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
3 Mar 191645.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany
3 Mar 191645.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
18 Jun 191645.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
2 Mar 192756.4SelectedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
29 Mar 192756.5ConfirmedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
14 Jun 192756.7InstalledBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
4 Mar 194978.4DiedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Sproll:
Bishop Johann Baptist Sproll (born , died ) Bishop of Rottenburg

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 48
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013