Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Burger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Thebae in Thebaide


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1880Born
2 Jul 190323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
1 Sep 192444.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
1 Sep 192444.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thebae in Thebaide
28 Oct 192444.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thebae in Thebaide
16 Mar 195271.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Burger
Bishop Wilhelm Burger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStühlingen

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018