Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Sozzifanti

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1824Born
26 Mar 186439.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
24 Sep 186439.9Ordained PriestPriest of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
27 Oct 187147.0AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
5 Nov 187147.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
1 Feb 188358.2DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccola Sozzifanti (VIAF: 89556064)
Bishop Niccola Sozzifanti (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

EventPlace
Birth PlacePistoia, Diocese of Pistoia e Prato
Ordained BishopSantissima TrinitÓ dei Monti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 18.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 457
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017