Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carles Soler Perdigó

Bishop Emeritus of Girona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1932 BornBarcelona
19 Mar 196027.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 199158.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
16 Jul 199158.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pandosia
22 Sep 199159.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pandosia
30 Oct 200169.1AppointedBishop of Girona, Spain
16 Jul 200875.8RetiredBishop of Girona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Carles Soler Perdigó:
Bishop Carles Soler Perdigó (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Girona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Girona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013