Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Benjamin Sleiman, O.C.D.

Archbishop of Baghdad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1946 BornGhalboun
8 Dec 197327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
29 Nov 200054.4AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
20 Jan 200154.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Jean Benjamin Sleiman
Archbishop Jean Benjamin Sleiman O.C.D. (born ) Archbishop of Baghdad

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Baghdad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,887

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Nov 2016