Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janko Šimrak

Deceased

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1883BornSichelburg
23 Aug 190825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
9 May 194258.9AppointedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
16 Aug 194259.2Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
9 Aug 194663.1DiedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Janko Šimrak:
Bishop Janko Šimrak (born , died ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 41
  • opd/c1: CB, 29 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015