Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Alojzije Cardinal Stepinac

Deceased

Archbishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Cardinal-Priest of San Paolo alla Regola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1898Born
26 Oct 193032.4Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
28 May 193436.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
28 May 193436.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopsis
24 Jun 193436.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicopsis
7 Dec 193739.5SucceededArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
12 Jan 195354.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 195354.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Paolo alla Regola
10 Feb 196061.7DiedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
3 Oct 1998Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Alojzije Stepinac (VIAF: 12316942)
Bl. Alojzije Cardinal Stepinac (born , died ) Archbishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrašić, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Ordained PriestSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopZagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Death PlaceKrašić, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb
BeatifiedMarija Bistrica, Shrine, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
  • a cardinal for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1934, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast