Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon-Pierre Saint-Hillien, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hinche


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1951BornGonaïves
8 Sep 197625.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
5 Oct 198029.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of Holy Cross
28 Dec 198029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
10 Dec 200251.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
10 Dec 200251.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
22 Feb 200351.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia
6 Aug 200958.0AppointedBishop of Hinche, Haïti
22 Jul 201564.0DiedBishop of Hinche, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Simon-Pierre Saint-Hillien:
Bishop Simon-Pierre Saint-Hillien C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Hinche

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,333
  • d: CB, 24 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 24 Jul 2015