Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasco Séirécov

Deceased

Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1920Born
18 Mar 194525.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 197555.5AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
26 Oct 197555.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
4 Jan 197756.9DiedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Vasco Séirécov
Bishop Vasco Séirécov (born , died ) Bishop of Nicopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlovdiv
Ordained BishopPlovdiv

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,848

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast