Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Metodi Dimitrov Stratiev, A.A. †

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria

Titular Archbishop of Diocletianopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1916Born
26 Jul 194226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
28 Apr 196347.2AppointedCoadjutor Apostolic Exarch of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria
28 Apr 196347.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Thracia
5 Sep 196549.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Thracia
9 Mar 197155.1SucceededApostolic Exarch of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria
18 Dec 199377.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Diocletianopolis in Thracia
5 Sep 199579.6RetiredApostolic Exarch of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria
12 May 200690.3DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Sofia (Bulgarian), Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Metodi Dimitrov Stratiev
Archbishop Metodi Dimitrov Stratiev A.A. (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Sofia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSrem-Jambol

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018