Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simeon Kokov (Kokoff), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Sofia e Plovdiv

Titular Bishop of Batnae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1897BornSekirovo
29 Jan 192326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Apr 195861.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
20 Apr 195861.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Batnae
4 Dec 196063.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Batnae
11 Jul 197477.5DiedApostolic Administrator of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Simeon Kokov (Kokoff):
Bishop Simeon Kokov (Kokoff) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Sofia e Plovdiv

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013