Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Setién Alberro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Sebastián, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1928Born
29 Jun 195123.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Sebastián, Spain
18 Sep 197244.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Sebastián, Spain
18 Sep 197244.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Minor
28 Oct 197244.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Minor
16 Feb 197950.9AppointedBishop of San Sebastián, Spain
13 Jan 200071.8ResignedBishop of San Sebastián, Spain
10 Jul 201890.3DiedBishop Emeritus of San Sebastián, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María Setién Alberro (VIAF: 65175807)
Bishop José María Setién Alberro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Sebastián

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHernani
Death PlaceSan Sebastián, Diocese of San Sebastián
Buried Place (Original)Presbyterium of the, Cathedral, San Sebastián, Diocese of San Sebastián

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 10 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 10 Jul 2018

Quantcast