Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Thomas (Ty) Schuerman

Auxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

Titular Bishop of Girba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1957 Born
17 May 198629.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jan 201759.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jan 201759.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Girba
17 Mar 201759.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girba

MicroData Summary for James Thomas (Ty) Schuerman
Bishop James Thomas (Ty) Schuerman (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milwaukee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurlington
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Milwaukee, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milwaukee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2017
  • c12: Website of the Diocese, 25 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 1 Feb 2017
  • c34: CB, 5 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Mar 2017