Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolome Gaspar Santos

Bishop of Iba, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1967 Born
27 Aug 199224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Malolos, Philippines
17 Feb 201850.2AppointedBishop of Iba, Philippines
30 Apr 201850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Iba, Philippines
25 May 201850.4InstalledBishop of Iba, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Bartolome Gaspar Santos
Bishop Bartolome Gaspar Santos (born ) Bishop of Iba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria, Bulacan, Diocese of Malolos
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral Basilica, Malolos, Diocese of Malolos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2018
  • ob: CB, 24 Feb 2018
  • c2: CB, 25 Feb 2018
  • i: CB, 5 Mar 2018
  • c34: CB, 24 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast