Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignazio Sanna

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1942 Born
11 Mar 196725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nuoro, Italy
22 Apr 200664.1AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
25 Jun 200664.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Sanna (VIAF: 14942139)
Archbishop Ignazio Sanna (born ) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrune, Diocese of Nuoro
Ordained PriestChurch, Orune, Diocese of Nuoro
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oristano, Archdiocese of Oristano

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Oristano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,175
  • c1/loc: AM, 25 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast