Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Pierre François Jean-Baptiste Salmon, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Iucundiana

Titular See: (San Girolamo de Urbe)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1896Born
20 Dec 192428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Jun 196467.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Iucundiana
28 Jun 196467.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iucundiana
24 Apr 198285.6DiedTitular Bishop of Iucundiana

MicroData Summary for Pierre François Jean-Baptiste Salmon
Abbot Pierre François Jean-Baptiste Salmon O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Iucundiana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoncourt

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018