Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Théodore Georges Romzha

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Appia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1911BornVeliky Bychkiv
25 Dec 193524.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
24 Dec 193625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
8 Sep 194433.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
8 Sep 194433.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Appia
21 Sep 194433.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appia
1 Nov 194736.5DiedApostolic Administrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
27 Jun 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Théodore Georges Romzha:
Bishop Bl. Théodore Georges Romzha (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 10.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 45
  • beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • od/c01: CB, 19 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 19 May 2015