Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Ritter, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prelate of Juruá, Acre, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Rhosus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1879Born
28 Oct 190425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Sep 193556.3AppointedPrelate of Juruá, Acre, Brazil
6 Sep 193556.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
24 Oct 193556.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
19 Jul 1942³63.2DiedPrelate of Juruá, Acre, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Ritter
Bishop Heinrich Ritter C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prelate of Juruá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiederndorf, Germany

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,935, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast