Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Julien Cardinal Ries

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Antonio di Padova a Circonvallazione Appia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1920BornFouches (Arlon), Belgium
12 Aug 194525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
23 Jan 201291.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bellicastrum
11 Feb 201291.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Bellicastrum
18 Feb 201291.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Antonio di Padova a Circonvallazione Appia
18 Feb 201291.8Elevated to Cardinal
20 Oct 201292.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Antonio di Padova a Circonvallazione Appia
23 Feb 201392.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Antonio di Padova a Circonvallazione Appia

MicroData Summary for Julien Ries:
Cardinal Julien Ries (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Antonio di Padova a Circonvallazione Appia

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • op: Website of the Diocese, 6 Jan 2012
  • c4/2b40: CB, 4 Feb 2012
  • ab: CB, 5 Feb 2012
  • 1a22: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,258
  • i: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2012
  • d: CB, 23 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013