Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arsène Richard

Deceased

Bishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1935BornSaint-Louis-de-Kent
11 Jun 196025.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 198550.5AppointedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
5 Feb 198650.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
6 Jan 198953.6DiedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick

MicroData Summary for Arsène Richard:
Bishop Arsène Richard (born , died ) Bishop of Bathurst in Canada

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015