Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manoel da Ressurreição, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1687AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
31 Aug 1687Ordained BishopArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
13 May 1688InstalledArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
16 Jan 1691DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel da Ressurreição:
Archbishop Manoel da Ressurreição O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013