Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Joaquín Ramos Umaña

Deceased

Bishop of El Salvador, Military

Titular Bishop of Sebarga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1938Born
11 Dec 197133.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 198749.1AppointedBishop of El Salvador, Military
7 Mar 198749.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebarga
25 Apr 198749.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebarga
25 Jun 199355.4DiedBishop of El Salvador, Military

MicroData Summary for Roberto Joaquín Ramos Umaña
Bishop Roberto Joaquín Ramos Umaña (born , died ) Bishop of El Salvador, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSonsonate

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,410
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018