Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Plante, P.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Choluteca, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1936Born
25 May 196124.7Solemn VowsMember of Société des Missions-Étrangères
24 Dec 196125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
14 Dec 200468.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Choluteca, Honduras
2 Feb 200568.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Choluteca, Honduras
17 Dec 200569.3SucceededBishop of Choluteca, Honduras
13 Jul 201275.9RetiredBishop of Choluteca, Honduras
24 May 201578.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Choluteca, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Guido Plante
Bishop Guido Plante P.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Choluteca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Canada

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,818
  • s: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2005
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2012
  • d: CB, 24 May 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018