Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Pinna

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1813Born
22 Dec 183825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Alghero, Italy
3 Jul 188268.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alghero, Italy
3 Jul 188268.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
27 Aug 188268.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
23 May 188773.7AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
17 Nov 189279.2DiedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Pinna
Bishop Paolo Pinna (born , died ) Bishop of Ampurias e Tempio

EventPlace
Birth PlacePozzomaggiore, Diocese of Alghero
Death PlaceCastelsardo

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 97, and Page 266
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 51
  • c2: CB, 4 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017