Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Campus Chessa

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1817Born
4 Apr 184023.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187154.8AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
18 Feb 187255.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
21 Mar 188770.1DiedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Campus Chessa
Bishop Filippo Campus Chessa (born , died ) Bishop of Ampurias e Tempio

EventPlace
Birth PlacePattada, Diocese of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)
Ordained BishopOzieri, Diocese of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 96
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1872, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017