Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Marongiu Delrio

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1819Born
10 Jun 184323.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187152.1AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
14 Apr 187252.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
5 Oct 190586.0DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Marongiu Delrio (VIAF: 89211481)
Archbishop Diego Marongiu Delrio (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBannari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Ordained BishopSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 573
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1872, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017